RI H6006 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the operation of low speed vehicles on certain Rhode Island roads under specific conditions.
Title
Low Speed Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6006.pdf |