RI H6006 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires all candidates to file the same number of campaign finance reports, all due at the same times, whether or not they have a contested primary election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Campaign Contributions And Expenditures Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-04-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback