RI H6007 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires training for police officers and trainees to more accurately identify complaints involving persons with cognitive or communication-related disabilities.
Title
Police Officers - Commission On Standards And Training
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019) |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6007.pdf |