RI H6033 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes sweeping changes to the law on massage therapy licensing.
Title
Licensing Of Massage Therapists
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |