RI H6034 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the existing provisions of the Corporate Charter and replaces them in their entirety.
Title
Amendment Of Corporate Charter
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2019-05-28 | House | House read and passed |
2019-05-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2019) |
2019-04-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |