RI H6044 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the exemption that allows elected officials to appear on a Rhode Island PBS Foundation television station program one hundred and twenty (120) days before any election in which they are a candidate.
Title
Political Advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6044.pdf |