RI H6063 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Study Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations On The Method And Necessary Procedures For The Implementation Of Rhode Island's Action Plan To Stand Up To Climate Change (creates A 16 Member Commission To Study The Methods And Procedures For The Implementation Of Rhode Island's Action Plan To Stand Up To Climate Change, And Would Report Back To The House By April 15, 2020, And Expire On May 15, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Study Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations On The Method And Necessary Procedures For The Implementation Of Rhode Island's Action Plan To Stand Up To Climate Change (creates A 16 Member Commission To Study The Methods And Procedures For The Implementation Of Rhode Island's Action Plan To Stand Up To Climate Change, And Would Report Back To The House By April 15, 2020, And Expire On May 15, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6063.pdf |