RI H6064 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes process to set maximum contaminate levels of polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS).
Title
Pfas In Drinking And Surface Waters
Sponsors
Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6064.pdf |