RI H6069 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Rhode Island Marijuana Social Equity Program to provide opportunities to people, who reside in areas determined to be disproportionately harmed by marijuana prohibition and enforcement, in gaining access to the marijuana industry.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act--the Rhode Island Marijuana Social Equity Program
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6069.pdf |