RI H6090 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the name of the drug court magistrate to the "Rhode Island Superior Court adult drug/recovery court magistrate and changes the name of the court to the "Rhode Island Superior Court adult drug/recovery court".
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2019) |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/14/2019) |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6090.pdf |