RI H6105 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes prisoner made goods program that permits director of corrections to contract companies that ship goods out of United States for production and allows inmates to be paid the federal minimum wage to produce in Rhode Island.
Title
Prisoner Made Goods
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6105.pdf |