RI H6113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits division of motor vehicles to issue probationary operator’s licenses to those who had their licenses suspended, under certain conditions and for reasons of extreme hardship. Offenses involving alcohol, injury or death would be ineligible.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2019) |
2019-05-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6113.pdf |