RI H6139 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends historic tax credits for 3 years until December 31, 2022, projects which have been funded through the Cultural Arts and the Economy Grant program, as enacted in chapter 145 of the 2014 Pub. L., and which would have expired on December 31, 2019.
Title
Historic Preservation Tax Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6139.pdf |