RI H6153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state and local incremental tax revenues generated in the arts district, the growth center district and the ballpark district in the city of Pawtucket to be allocated to finance improvements in the districts.
Title
Redevelopment Agencies And Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. John Lyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2019) |
2019-05-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |