RI H6180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes board of trustees for URI; establishes transfer of URI research foundation authority to board of governors if foundation dissolved; removes authority of council on postsecondary education over URI, requires disclosure of tuition waivers.
Title
Relating To The Governance Of The University Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6180.pdf |