RI H6189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an opioid stewardship payment program which manufacturers and distributors of opioids would pay into, to support opioid treatment programs.
Title
Opioid Stewardship Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2019) |
2019-06-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6189.pdf |