RI H6205 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows John F. Fulone to join Victoria Hippert and Justin DeFreitas in marriage on or about October 11, 2019, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-06-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |