RI H6214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to the disclosure requirements to be made by the sellers of one to four (4) units of residential real estate, any modifications made to the electrical, heating, plumbing, and ventilation systems.
Title
Real Estate Sales Disclosures
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Jose Serodio [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |