RI H6256 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To February 5, 2020, And Would Expire On May 5, 2020.)
Title
House Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Known As The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The "rhode Island Online Data Transparency And Privacy Protection Commission" From February 5, 2019, To February 5, 2020, And Would Expire On May 5, 2020.)
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6256.pdf |