RI H7002 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individual or group policy insurance to cover mastectomies.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/12/2018) |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-02-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |