RI H7026 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines and prohibits dismemberment abortions with certain exceptions.
Title
The Rhode Island Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7026.pdf |