RI H7075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Makes possession bump stocks, binary triggers or trigger cranks punishable by up to10 years in imprisonment and/or a $10,000 fine and penalizes modification of semi-automatic weapons to full automatic fire with a single pull or hold in the same way.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |