RI H7104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOT to identify the impact of Rhode Works projects and the realignment of the Newport Bridge ramps on Rhode Island small business commercial areas.
Title
Department Of Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee transferred to House Small Business |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |