RI H7123 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows students in public schools to possess and use a topical sunscreen product.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2020-02-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-02-11 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/12/2020) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |