RI H7206 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the selection pool for court appointed receivers be composed of at least ten percent (10%) of receivers who are persons of color.
Title
Courts - Court Administration
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7206.pdf |