RI H7234 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes physical therapists to order diagnostic imaging (x-rays). Authority sunsets December 31, 2022.
Title
Physical Therapists
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2020-03-06 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/12/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7234.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7234A.pdf |