RI H7259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for specific fines and sanctions to operators of motor vehicles who fail to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a vulnerable road user causing injury, serious injury, or death to the vulnerable road user.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7259.pdf |