RI H7262 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Meeting postponed (03/07/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Meeting postponed (03/07/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies who has the authority to nominate the members of a local canvassing authority.
Title
Local Canvassing Authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7262.pdf |