RI H7306 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Plastic Waste Reduction Act" designed to reduce the use of plastic bags by retail establishments by offering recyclable bag options and providing penalties for violations.
Title
Plastic Waste Reduction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7306.pdf |