RI H7333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows 288 hours of trade school training to qualify for the journeyperson "B" electrical exam. Increases the period of indentured apprenticeship with the department of labor and training and a licensed electrician master to 4 years.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7333.pdf |