RI H7340 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the state from restricting persons from terminating pregnancy prior to fetal viability. Would repeal laws regulating abortion.
Title
The Reproductive Health Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Moira Walsh [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7340.pdf |