RI H7350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the driver of a vehicle overtaking another vehicle proceeding in the same direction to use a directional signal and repeals the requirement that such signal be audible.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7350.pdf |