RI H7362 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the title of the Biodiesel Heating Oil Act of 2013 to Biodiesel Products provides significant updates to the act as well as minimum standards for biodiesel.
Title
Biodiesel Heating Oil Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7362.pdf |