RI H7408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax assessors in the cities and towns to use the last statutory update or revaluation as the assessed valuation upon which to levy taxes regarding their real property.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7408.pdf |