RI H7425 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disbands the Smithfield Land Trust and transfers all function and real estate held by the Smithfield Land Trust to the town of Smithfield and Smithfield town council.
Title
Relating To The Smithfield Land Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2018) |
2018-02-20 | House | Meeting postponed (03/01/2018) |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7425.pdf |