RI H7475 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that financial security is required for any motor vehicle registered or required to be registered in the state of Rhode Island.
Title
Motor Vehicle Reparations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7475.pdf |