RI H7516 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from taxation the donation of alcoholic beverages to nonprofit organizations that are exempt from federal taxation under ยง 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/24/2018) |
2018-05-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7516.pdf |