RI H7589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the attorney general to file, within ninety (90) days of a complaint alleging a violation of the open meetings law, a report detailing the results of the investigation into that complaint.
Title
Open Meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Mendonca [R] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7589.pdf |