RI H7642 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides immediate family members or two (2) guests of residents of the Rhode Island veterans' home access to the dining room for lunch and/or dinner at no charge to the resident, family members or guests.
Title
Rhode Island Veterans' Home
Sponsors
Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. James Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7642.pdf |