RI H7652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Conversion Act to add the transaction's compliance with the Rhode Island Antitrust Act to the list of criteria for review by the Attorney General.
Title
The Hospital Conversions Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Mario Mendez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-07-01 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |