RI H7884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows James S. Bennett to join Pamela L. Caiano and Anthony F. Rosciti in marriage on or about May 29, 2020, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | House | House read and passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |