RI H7896 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/07/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-07 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/07/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that electors that cast emergency ballots in the 12 day period prior to any election day sign an electronic pollbook giving a reason why they cannot get to the polls and vote be cast immediately into a voting machine.
Title
Mail Ballots
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (07/07/2020) |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7896.pdf |