RI H7947 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new process with standards to be utilized when deciding whether an applicant's past conviction of a crime should disqualify the applicant from receiving an occupational license, permit, certificate, or registration issued by the state.
Title
Equal Opportunity And Affirmative Action -- Licensing
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |