RI H7970 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends several processes relative to the termination of a time-share agreement and the division of the ownership interests thereto.
Title
Rhode Island Real Estate Time-share Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |