RI H8092 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Cranston to issue not more than Five Million Dollars ($5,000,000) bonds and notes for the acquisition, equipping and installation of renewable energy and energy conservation improvements in public buildings.
Title
Authorizing The City Of Cranston To Finance The Acquisition, Equipping And Installation Of Renewable Energy And Energy Conservation Improvements That Reduce Energy Costs And/or Use Of Fossil Fuels In Public Buildings And Facilities In The City And All Attendant Expenses, Including But Not Limited To, Engineering Costs By The Issuance Of Not More Than $5,000,000 General Obligation Bonds And Notes Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-25 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-09 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2020-07-03 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/09/2020) |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |