RI H8095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Frank Montanaro to join Nicole Alexis Powrie and Joseph William Pronk in marriage on or about August 8, 2020, within the Town of Lincoln, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-07-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-16 | House | House read and passed |
2020-07-14 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/16/2020) |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-07-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/07/2020) |
2020-07-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |