RI H8240 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that students in the seventh grade receive education in Internet safety.
Title
Health And Safety Of Pupils
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2018) |
2018-05-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H8240.pdf |