RI S0026 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurance coverage for at least ninety (90) days of residential or inpatient services for mental health and/or substance-use disorders for American Society of Addiction Medicine levels of care 3.1 and 3.3.
Title
Insurance Coverage For Mental Illness And Substance Abuse
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/SenateText19/S0026.pdf |