RI S0031 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Charlestown Municipal Court: would authorize the Charlestown town council to expand the jurisdiction of its municipal court over traffic and parking violations and would increase the maximum fine the court may impose from $300 to $500.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- Charlestown Municipal Court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-28 Signed by Governor
2011-06-22 Transmitted to Governor
2011-06-22 Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2011-06-16 Placed on Senate Calendar
2011-06-15 House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2011-06-08 Placed on House Calendar
2011-06-08 Committee recommends passage of Sub A
2011-06-08 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-05-10 Referred to House Municipal Government
2011-05-05 Senate read and passed
2011-05-03 Placed on Senate Calendar
2011-04-28 Committee recommends passage
2011-04-28 Scheduled for consideration
2011-03-17 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2011-03-17 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-01-11 Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback