RI S0031 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-03 - Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Taxation -- Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes (would Increase From 3 To 5 Years The Interval Of Time Within Which A City Or Town Must Conduct An Update Of Its Last Real Property Revaluation.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Taxation -- Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes (would Increase From 3 To 5 Years The Interval Of Time Within Which A City Or Town Must Conduct An Update Of Its Last Real Property Revaluation.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-03SenatePlaced on House Calendar (07/03/2013)
2013-07-03SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2013-07-03SenateScheduled for consideration (07/03/2013)
2013-07-01SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2013-07-01SenateScheduled for consideration (07/01/2013)
2013-05-02SenateReferred to House Municipal Government
2013-05-02SenateSenate read and passed
2013-04-30SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (05/02/2013)
2013-04-24SenateCommittee recommends passage
2013-04-19SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013)
2013-03-05SenateCommittee transferred to Senate Finance
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback